TN SB1897 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-27 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each local school board to establish a school lunch program and a school breakfast program that provides a free breakfast and lunch to each student enrolled in a school under the board's jurisdiction; requires the state to reimburse each LEA the cost of providing a free breakfast and lunch to each student enrolled in the LEA after all available federal funds have been applied. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to school meals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1744 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-06 - Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee