TN SB1884 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revokes outgoing mail privileges of inmates convicted of sexual offenses and not registered as sexual offenders for contact by mail with victims and victims' families. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, revokes outgoing mail privileges of inmates convicted of sexual offenses and not registered as sexual offenders for contact by mail with victims and victims' families. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2 and Title 41.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1688 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-01 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1884&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1884.pdf |