TN SB1877 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-22 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits a person who owns real property and who has not paid taxes on a portion of real property for more than 20 years to bring any action to recover the property if the failure to pay taxes was due to the error of a land surveyor. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 66 and Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits a person who owns real property and who has not paid taxes on a portion of real property for more than 20 years to bring any action to recover the property if the failure to pay taxes was due to the error of a land surveyor. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 66 and Title 67, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-22SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2016
2016-01-25SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2016-01-21SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-20SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1914 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback