TN SB1868 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the bureau of TennCare to report annually an accounting of the amount paid to MCOs under the CHOICES program in the prior fiscal year and the amount paid by MCOs for long-term care services in that same fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the bureau of TennCare to report annually an accounting of the amount paid to MCOs under the CHOICES program in the prior fiscal year and the amount paid by MCOs for long-term care services in that same fiscal year. - Amends TCA Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Overbey [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. H&W Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. H&W Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1878 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-18 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1868&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1868.pdf |