TN SB1855 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the time period for filing an answer denying the charges or setting forth extenuating circumstances from 20 days to 30 days after notice of a court withholding, withdrawing, or suspending a bondsman or other surety. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, changes the time period for filing an answer denying the charges or setting forth extenuating circumstances from 20 days to 30 days after notice of a court withholding, withdrawing, or suspending a bondsman or other surety. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1964 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee