TN SB1844 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 805
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 805
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that a registered charitable organization providing food, housing, or shelter from adverse weather to the community is not liable for any loss, damages, injury, or death that results from providing such services unless the charitable organization's conduct constitutes gross negligence or willful and wanton misconduct. - Amends TCA Title 20; Title 29, Chapter 34 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 20; Title 29, Chapter 34 and Title 48, relative to causes of action.
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Watson [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] |
Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 805 | |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1765 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-13 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022