TN SB1844 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises quality assurance funding to state institutions of higher education based on the institution's teacher training program outcomes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, revises quality assurance funding to state institutions of higher education based on the institution's teacher training program outcomes. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1481 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-09 - Taken off notice for cal. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee