TN SB1822 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to report to the general assembly regarding the amount of money received pursuant to the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act no later than January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of finance and administration to report to the general assembly regarding the amount of money received pursuant to the Ground Ambulance Service Provider Assessment Act no later than January 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 7; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2137 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee