TN SB1821 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, repeals the Locksmith Licensing Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 11; Title 62, Chapter 35 and Title 62, Chapter 76.
Title
As introduced, repeals the Locksmith Licensing Act of 2006. - Amends TCA Title 62, Chapter 11; Title 62, Chapter 35 and Title 62, Chapter 76.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/3/2020 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1843 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/18/2020