TN SB1821 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a juvenile court from issuing a valid court order upon an unruly child or a child whose only offense is a status offense. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a juvenile court from issuing a valid court order upon an unruly child or a child whose only offense is a status offense. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on last calendar 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/19/18 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar 4/18/18 |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2658 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee