TN SB1809 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the treasurer to invest state funds in a debt obligation issued and guaranteed by a foreign sovereign government, subject to appropriation. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the treasurer to invest state funds in a debt obligation issued and guaranteed by a foreign sovereign government, subject to appropriation. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/5/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/27/2018 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2684 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-18 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee