TN SB1805 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes COVID-19 essential employee retirement service credit for members of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system and participants in the state's hybrid retirement plan. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 34 and Title 8, Chapter 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 34 and Title 8, Chapter 36, relative to COVID-19.
Sponsors
Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage as amended, refer to Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/22/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1658 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee