TN SB1798 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a firefighter's cancer that causes a disabling health condition is a result of the firefighter's duties as a firefighter. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Title
As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a firefighter's cancer that causes a disabling health condition is a result of the firefighter's duties as a firefighter. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51; Title 50, Chapter 6 and Title 68, Chapter 102.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] | Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] |
Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Mark Green [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/20/2018 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1491 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-21 - Sponsor(s) Added.