TN SB1797 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-21 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, abolishes the ASD at the close of the 2015-2016 school year; requires, beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, all schools that perform in the bottom 2.5 percent of schools in overall achievement as determined by the performance standards of the state board to be governed under an innovation zone. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, abolishes the ASD at the close of the 2015-2016 school year; requires, beginning with the 2017-2018 school year, all schools that perform in the bottom 2.5 percent of schools in overall achievement as determined by the performance standards of the state board to be governed under an innovation zone. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1787 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-26 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1797&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1797.pdf |