TN SB1796 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 28-5)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 1065
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases the amount on which property tax reimbursement will be paid from the first $23,000 to the first $23,500 for low-income, elderly homeowners and for disabled homeowners; removes the income limitation applicable for tax relief for disabled veteran homeowners. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, increases the amount on which property tax reimbursement will be paid from the first $23,000 to the first $23,500 for low-income, elderly homeowners and for disabled homeowners; removes the income limitation applicable for tax relief for disabled veteran homeowners. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Make Action of the Senate MOTION TO ADOPT Conference Committee Report (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT MINORITY REPORT (Y: 25 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT MINORITY REPORT (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 58 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT MINORITY REPORT (Y: 34 N: 45 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Fitzhugh (Y: 26 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Fitzhugh (Y: 56 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 3 BY Fitzhugh (Y: 57 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-23 Pub. Ch. 1065
2016-05-23 Effective date(s) 05/20/2016
2016-05-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2016-05-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2016-05-13HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2016-05-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2016-04-25SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2016-04-22HouseConf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 58, Nays 18 PNV 1
2016-04-22SenateConference Committee report adopted, ayes 28 nays 1, PNV 1 (CC0015)
2016-04-21SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/22/2016
2016-04-21SenateConference Committee appointed ( Ragan, McCormick, Camper, Zachary, Casada)
2016-04-21SenateConference Committee appointed. (Overybey, Norris, Johnson)
2016-04-21SenateSenate refused to recede from its non-concurrence.
2016-04-21SenateSenate refused to concur in H. amendment #3 and H. amendment #7
2016-04-21HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 81, Nays 3, PNV 0
2016-04-21HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar 3 for 4/21/2016
2016-04-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 7 - HA1257)
2016-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2016
2016-04-21HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2016-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2016
2016-04-21HouseRe-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2016-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 6 - HA1256)
2016-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 5 - HA1255)
2016-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 4 - HA1253)
2016-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA1230)
2016-04-21HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1092)
2016-04-21HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA1245)
2016-04-20HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2016
2016-04-20HouseReset on cal. for 4/21/2016
2016-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2016-04-20HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2016-04-19SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-19SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2016-04-19SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2016-04-19SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA1036)
2016-04-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016
2016-04-18SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0
2016-04-14SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2016
2016-04-13SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2016
2016-04-13SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-13SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/13/2016
2016-04-12SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/13/2016
2016-04-11SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-04-06SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee3 calendar for 4/12/2016
2016-04-05SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2016-03-30SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2016-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2016
2016-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate State & Local Government Committee to 3/30/2016
2016-03-23SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/29/2016
2016-01-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2016-01-20SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2016-01-19SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2156 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1065

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback