TN SB1784 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that person convicted of DUI forfeit privilege to purchase alcohol for period of time based upon prior DUI convictions with lifetime forfeiture for third conviction; establishes new driver license format for person subject to alcohol purchase restriction; creates new Class C misdemeanor offense for unlawful purchase of alcohol by DUI offender or knowing sale of alcohol to person subject to alcohol purchase restriction. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 7; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 57.
Title
As introduced, requires that person convicted of DUI forfeit privilege to purchase alcohol for period of time based upon prior DUI convictions with lifetime forfeiture for third conviction; establishes new driver license format for person subject to alcohol purchase restriction; creates new Class C misdemeanor offense for unlawful purchase of alcohol by DUI offender or knowing sale of alcohol to person subject to alcohol purchase restriction. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 7; Title 40; Title 55 and Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/24/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/17/2018 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/3/2018 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/2/2018 |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1698 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-17 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration