TN SB1782 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-01 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, raises from a Class A misdemeanor to a Class E felony certain animal cruelty offenses involving a cock; requires a fine of not less than $1,000 nor more than $2,500 for the offense of being a spectator at a cock fight. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 39, Chapter 14, Part 2, relative to cock fighting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 22, Nays 7 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/28/2024 |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Motion to lift from the table adopted. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/25/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/11/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/5/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2068 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Held on desk.