TN SB1775 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, removes the commissioner of the department of commerce and insurance's ability to establish a monitoring inspection fee paid by manufactured home manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 67 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, removes the commissioner of the department of commerce and insurance's ability to establish a monitoring inspection fee paid by manufactured home manufacturers. - Amends TCA Title 55; Title 67 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-06-18HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2020-06-18HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0958)
2020-06-18HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0610)
2020-06-18HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-06-15HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-06-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-06-11SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-06-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0714)
2020-06-11SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0620)
2020-06-10SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 6/11/2020
2020-03-16SenateRe-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
2020-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/16/2020
2020-03-11SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/11/2020
2020-03-04SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/11/2020
2020-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/4/2020
2020-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to 3/4/2020
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 2/26/2020
2020-02-19SenateRefer to Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
2020-02-19SenateRecalled from Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2020-01-27SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2020-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2201 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-18 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback