TN SB1772 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the reimbursement amount for property tax relief for disabled veteran homeowners; increases the reimbursement amount from payment on the first $175,000 of the full market value of the home to payment on the first $300,000 of the full market value. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 5, Part 7, relative to property tax relief for veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2024 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1941 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-28 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee of Local Government Committee