TN SB1767 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-11 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, permits the speakers, chief justice, constitutional officers and state homeland security advisor to request TBI background investigations on all people who have unsupervised access or contact with sensitive government information or identifying information. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, permits the speakers, chief justice, constitutional officers and state homeland security advisor to request TBI background investigations on all people who have unsupervised access or contact with sensitive government information or identifying information. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2134 (Crossfiled) 2014-03-05 - Failed In s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1767&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1767.pdf |