TN SB1767 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises provisions governing maximum liability under the Tennessee Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Act in regard to annuity benefits to increase liability amount from $100,000 to $250,000. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 12.
Title
As enacted, revises provisions governing maximum liability under the Tennessee Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Act in regard to annuity benefits to increase liability amount from $100,000 to $250,000. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 12.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 178 | |
2009-04-27 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0241) | |
2009-04-27 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/27/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | S. Reset on cal. for 04/27/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/23/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | S. Reset on cal. for 04/23/2009 | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 04/20/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/10/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0981 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 178