TN SB1763 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 198
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for the practice of foreclosure-rescue consulting; a violation of requirements will be considered a violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for the practice of foreclosure-rescue consulting; a violation of requirements will be considered a violation of the Tennessee Consumer Protection Act. - Amends TCA Title 45 and Title 47.
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Herron [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-15 - Senate - S. C,L&A COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 198 | |
2009-04-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0256) | |
2009-04-20 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0255) | |
2009-04-20 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2009-04-20 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 04/20/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-04-09 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2218 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-21 - Pub. Ch. 198