TN SB1722 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a court in making a decree or order for child support set a presumptive date for the termination of the current child support obligation. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-101.
Title
As introduced, requires that a court in making a decree or order for child support set a presumptive date for the termination of the current child support obligation. - Amends TCA Section 36-5-101.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/21/2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/14/2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/14/2010 | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/13/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/30/2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 03/23/2010 | |
2009-05-27 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/27/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/20/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0005 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-20 - Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/25/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1722&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB1722.pdf |