TN SB1721 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a state employee to repay the cost of a tuition and fee waiver at a public institution of higher education if the student withdraws or fails the course in which the state employee enrolled with the waiver; requires the amount of the waiver be paid before enrolling in another course at a public institution of higher education, unless the state employee shows that the withdrawal or failure was the result of a documented medical or personal reason. - Amends TCA Section 8-50-114; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires a state employee to repay the cost of a tuition and fee waiver at a public institution of higher education if the student withdraws or fails the course in which the state employee enrolled with the waiver; requires the amount of the waiver be paid before enrolling in another course at a public institution of higher education, unless the state employee shows that the withdrawal or failure was the result of a documented medical or personal reason. - Amends TCA Section 8-50-114; Title 49, Chapter 8; Title 49, Chapter 9 and Title 49, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 2 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0528) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0607) |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2016 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/15/2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 3/8/2016 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/1/2016 |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/10/2016 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 2/10/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/3/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1675 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-29 - Def. to Summer Study