TN SB1690 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 877
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 877
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a suspension of tank fees under the Tennessee Petroleum Underground Storage Tank Act, in certain situations; revises certain provisions regarding the petroleum underground storage tank fund. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As enacted, authorizes a suspension of tank fees under the Tennessee Petroleum Underground Storage Tank Act, in certain situations; revises certain provisions regarding the petroleum underground storage tank fund. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 877 | |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2016 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/11/2016 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee to 3/14/2016 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/7/2016 |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1503 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 877