TN SB1690 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 984
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 984
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "serious bodily injury" to include a broken bone of a child who is 12 years of age or younger; revises the provision whereby an order authorizing a wiretap or electronic surveillance must require that reports be made to the judge who issued the order showing what progress has been made toward achievement of the authorized objective and the need for continued interception. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, redefines "serious bodily injury" to include a broken bone of a child who is 12 years of age or younger; revises the provision whereby an order authorizing a wiretap or electronic surveillance must require that reports be made to the judge who issued the order showing what progress has been made toward achievement of the authorized objective and the need for continued interception. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 2 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 984 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-28 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-17 | House | S. concurred in H. am. 2 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/17/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA1307) |
2014-04-16 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1137) |
2014-04-16 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1002) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/3/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/4/2014 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 2/25/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2177 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 984