TN SB1679 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-24 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits certain actions by electric and natural gas utilities regarding smart meters. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits certain actions by electric and natural gas utilities regarding smart meters. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 47, Chapter 18 and Title 65.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-24SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2018-01-22SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2018-01-18SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2490 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback