TN SB1679 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the Class A misdemeanor offense of sexual contact by an authority figure which is defined as an adult with supervisory or disciplinary power over a minor, unlawfully kissing the minor for the purpose of sexual arousal or gratification. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5 and Title 40, Chapter 39.
Title
As enacted, creates the Class A misdemeanor offense of sexual contact by an authority figure which is defined as an adult with supervisory or disciplinary power over a minor, unlawfully kissing the minor for the purpose of sexual arousal or gratification. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13, Part 5 and Title 40, Chapter 39.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88 | |
2011-04-04 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-04-01 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 4/4/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-23 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-17 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1577 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Pub. Ch. 88