TN SB1649 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-18 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates the Tennessee violence intervention program within the department's office of criminal justice programs to invest in evidence-based violence reduction initiatives. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38; Title 39 and Title 40, relative to the Tennessee violence intervention program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1845 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Taken off notice for cal. in Criminal Justice Committee