TN SB1634 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, establishes additional qualifications for service as a member of the city's electric power board by requiring one member to be on the city council, members to be property holders in their places of residence, and members to reside within their respective cities or unincorporated areas for one (1) year preceding their appointment; establishes terms of service for board members; and establishes a procedure for filling vacancies on the board. - Amends Chapter 231 of the Private Acts of 1980.
Title
AN ACT to amend Chapter 231 of the Private Acts of 1980; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the Electric Power Board for the City of Rockwood.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Pr. Ch. 13 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1616 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 13