TN SB1621 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pr. Ch. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, increases the rate of the occupancy tax from 5 percent to 7 percent; changes the distribution and use of the tax revenue. - Amends Chapter 98 of the Private Acts of 1983; as amended.
Title
AN ACTto amend Chapter 98 of the Private Acts of 1983; as amended by Chapter 186 of the Private Acts of 1992 and Chapter 187 of the Private Acts of 1998; and any other acts amendatory thereto, relative to the hotel occupancy tax in Henderson County.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-19 | Pr. Ch. 12 | |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-19 | House | Passed H., Ayes 79, Nays 9, PNV 5 |
2021-04-19 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Local Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, held on desk. Local Bill |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1511 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 12