TN SB1617 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires local boards of education to notify the commissioner of education when a board declares itself a high performing school district; requires the commissioner to post a list of high performing school districts on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires local boards of education to notify the commissioner of education when a board declares itself a high performing school district; requires the commissioner to post a list of high performing school districts on the department's website. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2197 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-28 - Sponsor change.