TN SB1570 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Pub. Ch. 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates sunrise provision for local governing boards of trustees of the board of regents state universities, to terminate June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, creates sunrise provision for local governing boards of trustees of the board of regents state universities, to terminate June 30, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2; Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 1 and Title 49, Chapter 8, Part 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Pub. Ch. 707 | |
2018-04-23 | Effective date(s) 04/12/2018 | |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-03-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-03-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/26/2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 2/21/2018 |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1663 (Crossfiled) 2018-04-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 707