TN SB1560 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on June 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-07-06 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises of the Memphis Zoo during the zoo's regular operating hours. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-101.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the sale of alcoholic beverages and beer for consumption on the premises of the Memphis Zoo during the zoo's regular operating hours. - Amends TCA Section 57-4-101.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 60 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-30HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2020-06-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2020-06-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2020-06-18HousePassed H., Ayes 60, Nays 26, PNV 4
2020-06-17HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2020-03-05HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-03-03SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-03-02SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 3, PNV 2
2020-02-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/2/2020
2020-02-25SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/25/2020
2020-02-18SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/25/2020
2020-02-11SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/18/2020
2020-02-11SenateAction deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2/18/2020
2020-02-04SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/11/2020
2020-01-16SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-12-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1723 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-17 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback