TN SB1558 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Pub. Ch. 1034
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the criminal gang enhancement statute. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, revises the criminal gang enhancement statute. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] | Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] |
Sen. Mark Green [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Reginald Tate [D] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-05 | Pub. Ch. 1034 | |
2016-05-05 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2016 | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2016-04-20 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - HA1247) |
2016-04-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA1027) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA1015) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA1042) |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA1031) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/20/2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/19/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/14/2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. Judiciary Comm. 4/14/16 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/12/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/5/2016 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1479 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1034