TN SB1534 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes certain restrictions and limitations on state election commission, secretary of state, coordinator of elections, county election commission, and administrators of elections in regard to funding for elections, the acceptance of certain gifts, and the expenditure of certain funds. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, relative to private funding for elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 05/04/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 306 | |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed H., Ayes 72, Nays 20, PNV 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0242) |
2021-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0281) |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0210) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0966 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 306