TN SB1530 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 335
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies that juvenile courts, general sessions courts, and circuit and criminal courts have concurrent jurisdiction to hear criminal prosecutions of child abuse and neglect.
Title
As enacted, specifies that juvenile courts, general sessions courts, and circuit and criminal courts have concurrent jurisdiction to hear criminal prosecutions of child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-13 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Pub. Ch. 335 | |
2009-06-05 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-01 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2009-05-18 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 2 | |
2009-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0355) | |
2009-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0354) | |
2009-05-18 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2009-05-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2009-05-18 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 1 | |
2009-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - SA0504) | |
2009-05-18 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0503) | |
2009-05-18 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - SA0541) | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 05/18/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-05-01 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1260 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 335