TN SB1529 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the board of physical therapy, June 30, 2019; revises the manner in which members of the board of physical therapy are selected. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Title
As enacted, extends the board of physical therapy, June 30, 2019; revises the manner in which members of the board of physical therapy are selected. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 63, Chapter 13, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-26 - Senate - S. GOVT. OPS. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 600 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0673) |
2014-03-10 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0740) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 3/10/2014 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/6/2014 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 2/26/2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1582 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-14 - Pub. Ch. 600