TN SB1517 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts sales of gun safes from sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, relative to purchases of gun safes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.