TN SB1482 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends continued health coverage to the surviving spouses and children of park rangers who are killed in the line of duty to the same extent as survivors of other first responders who are killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 8; Title 11 and Title 58.
Title
As enacted, extends continued health coverage to the surviving spouses and children of park rangers who are killed in the line of duty to the same extent as survivors of other first responders who are killed in the line of duty. - Amends TCA Title 7; Title 8; Title 11 and Title 58.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 189 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2020 | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-08 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0245) |
2019-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0176) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1134 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 189