TN SB1480 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 924
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends to all local governments the authorization that county governments currently have to use local funds to rehabilitate or maintain dilapidated or abandoned cemeteries that do not maintain a sufficient improvement care trust fund or are not maintained adequately. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, extends to all local governments the authorization that county governments currently have to use local funds to rehabilitate or maintain dilapidated or abandoned cemeteries that do not maintain a sufficient improvement care trust fund or are not maintained adequately. - Amends TCA Title 46, Chapter 2, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 924 | |
2016-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2016 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2016-04-13 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2016-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2016-02-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 2/8/2016 |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/2/2016 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2436 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 924