TN SB1457 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 941
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 941
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes various new special license plates and revises certain present law provisions regarding special license plates, including certain veterans' plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes various new special license plates and revises certain present law provisions regarding special license plates, including certain veterans' plates. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] | Rep. Vince Dean [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 6 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 5 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY Dean PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 5 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONSIDER AMENDMENT # 6 BY Dean PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 941 |
2014-06-03 | House | Effective date(s) 05/19/2014 |
2014-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-08 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-24 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #6 |
2014-04-16 | House | S. concurred in H. am. #5 |
2014-04-16 | House | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 6 of 0 - HA1317) |
2014-04-15 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 5 of 0 - HA1281) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 4 - HA1280) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 3 - HA1195) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1194) |
2014-04-15 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0928) |
2014-04-15 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA1077) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1123) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/8/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-15 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Trans & Safety Comm. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-07 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1486 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 941