TN SB1435 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that an audiovisual recording be made of any interrogation of a child who has been taken into custody on suspicion that the child committed a delinquent act or unruly conduct; states that the requirement may not be waived. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to interrogations of juveniles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0172) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0340 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.