TN SB1432 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits a handgun carry permit holder from carrying a firearm when entering a public park or an event occurring at the park if a ticket or pass is required for entry and the park is owned or operated by a county or municipality, an instrumentality, or a company contracting with the government to conduct the event; prohibits firearms in arenas, stadiums, and structures where a professional sports team plays, practices, or trains. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Title
As introduced, prohibits a handgun carry permit holder from carrying a firearm when entering a public park or an event occurring at the park if a ticket or pass is required for entry and the park is owned or operated by a county or municipality, an instrumentality, or a company contracting with the government to conduct the event; prohibits firearms in arenas, stadiums, and structures where a professional sports team plays, practices, or trains. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 13.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1409 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-23 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1432&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB1432.pdf |