TN SB1424 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a municipal utility system or metropolitan electric plant that established a program before January 1, 2021, for purposes of accepting and distributing excess receipts for bona fide charitable purposes, and that operates the program on an opt-out basis, to begin operating the program on an opt-in basis by January 1, 2024. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 34; Title 7, Chapter 52 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 34; Title 7, Chapter 52 and Title 65, relative to utility programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1067 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Failed in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee