TN SB1416 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds "Amazing Grace" by John Newton as an official state song. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 1, Part 3, relative to state symbols.
Sponsors
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] |
Sen. Steve Southerland [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 296 | |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0938 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 04/30/2021