TN SB1397 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 24 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee Duck River development agency to set a per thousand-gallon fee to charge participating entities for water withdrawals; makes other changes to the operation of the agency. - Amends TCA Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 64, Chapter 1, Part 6, relative to the Tennessee Duck River development agency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-07 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0530) |
2024-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-04-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0518) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/9/2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/2/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/26/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 2/7/2024 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0375 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-22 - Comp. SB subst.