TN SB1393 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes process for landlords to verify need of tenants and prospective tenants to have pet policies waived to accommodate the need for a service or support animal; creates penalties for misrepresentation. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 13, Chapter 20; Title 33; Title 39; Title 44, Chapter 17; Title 44, Chapter 8, Part 4; Title 63; Title 66 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, establishes process for landlords to verify need of tenants and prospective tenants to have pet policies waived to accommodate the need for a service or support animal; creates penalties for misrepresentation. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 21; Title 13, Chapter 20; Title 33; Title 39; Title 44, Chapter 17; Title 44, Chapter 8, Part 4; Title 63; Title 66 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 236 | |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/11/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1190 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 236