TN SB1385 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner to report to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate by January 15, 2018, on the geographic distribution and program adequacy of treatment resources for persons affected by substance abuse. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner to report to the health committee of the house of representatives and the health and welfare committee of the senate by January 15, 2018, on the geographic distribution and program adequacy of treatment resources for persons affected by substance abuse. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 29; Title 33; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 41; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0620 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee