TN SB1376 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 872
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 872
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates the offense of unlawful exposure, which is committed when a person distributes a private image of the intimate parts of another with the intent to cause emotional distress and the depicted person suffers emotional distress. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, creates the offense of unlawful exposure, which is committed when a person distributes a private image of the intimate parts of another with the intent to cause emotional distress and the depicted person suffers emotional distress. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 872 | |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/7/2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 3 PNV 0 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2016 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2015 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/7/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1244 (Crossfiled) 2016-05-02 - Pub. Ch. 872